ST MARY AND ST ABRAAM COPTIC ORTHODOX CHURCH

Charity number: 1003739
Charity reporting is up to date (334 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 September 2021 334 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 September 2021 334 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 24 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 24 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 12 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 12 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 14 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 14 July 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 25 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 25 October 2016 On time Download