ST MARY AND ST ABRAAM COPTIC ORTHODOX CHURCH

Charity number: 1003739
Charity reporting is up to date (334 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £501.49k £525.53k £684.76k £755.28k £670.73k
Total expenditure £493.65k £481.78k £601.93k £702.78k £737.88k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £240.00k £263.51k £403.69k £309.88k £345.25k
Income - Other trading activities £150.70k £90.52k £78.56k £222.47k £292.92k
Income - Charitable activities £76.07k £139.30k £167.32k £188.39k £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £34.72k £32.20k £35.19k £34.53k £32.56k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £178.01k £187.97k £257.80k £233.49k £445.29k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £293.80k £344.13k £469.29k £205.77k
Expenditure - Governance £7.29k £7.91k £23.36k £14.56k £107.55k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £39.39k £49.36k £62.39k £98.82k £0
Expenditure - Other £1.37k £0 £0 £0 £86.82k