ST JOSEPH'S SCHOOL NOTTINGHAM

Charity number: 1003916
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £1.12m £1.12m £1.08m £1.05m £895.06k
Total expenditure £1.09m £1.03m £1.05m £1.02m £936.20k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £169.98k £22.47k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £22.47k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.12m £1.12m £1.08m £1.04m £868.13k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £7.14k £4.47k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.09m £1.03m £1.05m £1.02m £929.26k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £11.79k £11.51k £11.55k £11.27k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £6.94k