Financial history HETTY GEORGE DRC TRUST

Charity number: 1003939
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £1.58k £1.54k £1.53k £1.51k £1.47k
Total expenditure £5.20k £5.52k £5.75k £5.54k £6.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A