Accounts and annual returns KOHN FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1003951
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 28 September 2020 On time
Annual return 31 December 2018 04 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 04 June 2019 On time
Annual return 31 December 2017 03 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 03 August 2018 On time
Annual return 31 December 2016 19 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 19 October 2017 On time