KOHN FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1003951
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £760.37k £264.93k £660.40k £31.12k £32.12k
Total expenditure £629.71k £494.53k £310.26k £328.97k £91.31k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £725.00k N/A £625.00k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment £35.37k N/A £35.40k N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £622.51k N/A £310.26k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £7.20k N/A £8.17k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £622.51k N/A £302.09k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A