TERRINGTON ST CLEMENT VILLAGE HALL FUND

Charity number: 1003978
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £8.46k £14.63k £16.06k £12.27k £15.83k
Total expenditure £9.31k £7.92k £20.34k £120.99k £10.66k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A £10.00k