Accounts and annual returns PERCY LEA CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1004097
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2022 17 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 26 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 22 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 23 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 22 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required