Accounts and annual returns Communities Together East Anglia

Charity number: 1004198
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 28 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 28 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 February 2021 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 18 February 2021 18 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 15 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 15 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 08 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

08 December 2017 On time Download Open in new window