Financial history Communities Together East Anglia

Charity number: 1004198
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £343.17k £429.80k £452.58k £309.80k £345.75k
Total expenditure £319.40k £393.19k £363.71k £333.93k £323.49k
Income from government contracts £270.29k £296.83k £164.44k £225.49k £207.20k
Income from government grants £15.00k N/A £15.00k £15.00k £15.00k