NATIONAL TRAINERS FEDERATION CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1004308
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £19.80k £101.29k £26.21k £24.44k £16.83k
Total expenditure £19.58k £8.47k £94.38k £21.08k £14.83k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A