THE UPPER ROOM (ST SAVIOUR'S)

Charity number: 1004354
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £457.57k £470.93k £458.90k £606.03k £563.51k
Total expenditure £333.52k £352.97k £362.43k £537.86k £569.61k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.00k £1.54k £3.36k £5.00k £39.77k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £581.93k £523.76k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £19.06k £18.23k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £16.66k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £2.05k £689
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £3.00k £4.17k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £100.90k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £495.62k £530.51k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £42.23k £39.11k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £0 £2.27k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0