THE KELVEDON TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing financial support for the relief of poverty and for religious activities and in connection with supporting from time to time specific charitable appeals from charitable organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
- Throughout London
Governance
- 08 October 1991: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EDWARD OWEN CATON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTINE ANN CATON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.75k | £7.50k | £7.61k | £7.80k | £7.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.00k | £10.50k | £10.00k | £7.50k | £4.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 03 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 12 March 2021 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 9TH MARCH 1990 AMENDED BY DEED DATED 27TH JUNE 1991
Charitable objects
(1)TO PROMOTE THE CAUSE OF THE PROPAGATION OF THE CHRISTIAN GOSPEL BY PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO THOSE PERSONS OR ORGANISATIONS ENGAGED IN SUCH CAUSE WHO ARE SUBSCRIBERS TO THE EVANGELICAL ALLIANCE BASIS OF FAITH (2)TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND LEARNING (3)TO RELIEVE POVERTY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Essex House
8 The Shrubberies
George Lane
LONDON
E18 1BD
- Phone:
- 02089890077
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window