ST PAUL'S CHURCH TRUST

Charity number: 1004425
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £470 £739 £3.56k £941 £739
Total expenditure £575 £0 £2.52k £0 £3.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A