ATHLETICS FOR THE YOUNG

Charity number: 1004448
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 28 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 26 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 29 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 23 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 07 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required