Trustees AVOCET TRUST

Charity number: 1004537
Charity reporting is overdue by 3 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Daniel Brown Trustee 08 December 2022
None on record
Ivan Spibey Trustee 08 September 2022
None on record
Christopher Bond Lefevre Trustee 10 March 2022
HOLDERNESS HEDGEHOG HOSPITAL
Overdue by 3 days
Julie Gaynor Hyam Trustee 02 March 2021
None on record
Richard Dibb Trustee 06 September 2019
None on record
Jacqueline Comerford Trustee 01 February 2019
None on record
ANDREW TEARLE Trustee 27 June 2016
None on record
CHRISTOPHER BROWN Trustee
None on record