Financial history LONDON SCHOOL OF SAMBA

Charity number: 1004609
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £123.70k £82.61k £86.38k £86.81k £86.81k
Total expenditure £129.24k £93.54k £107.16k £102.99k £102.99k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £31.50k