BUILDING AND CIVIL ENGINEERING CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education and training in and research into occupational health and safety in the building and civil engineering industries. Education, training and retraining for operatives, past operatives and young persons. Relief of beneficiaries who are in need by virtue of their financial situation, sickness or distress.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 14 October 1991: Standard registration
- 15 March 2013: Funds received from 326461 THE R I BECK TRUST
- B & C E CHARITABLE TRUST (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rupert Philip Perkins | Trustee | 05 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Paul Swain | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Vaughan Hart | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Iain Heath-Lay | Trustee | 13 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT JOHN BLACKMAN MIOSH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £699.63k | £658.09k | £363.89k | £623.83k | £393.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £834.54k | £620.63k | £400.44k | £618.40k | £393.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £699.41k | £658.01k | N/A | £623.64k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £226 | £80 | N/A | £195 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £834.54k | £620.63k | N/A | £618.40k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £439.11k | N/A | £152.39k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £143.18k | N/A | £288.01k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 03 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 13 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 13 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 19 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 19 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 16 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 16 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 2 OCTOBER 1991
Charitable objects
GENERAL CHARITABLE OBJECTS AND IN PARTICULAR 1 EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN AND RESEARCH INTO OCCUPATIONAL HEALTH AND SAFETY IN THE BUILDING AND CIVIL ENGINEERING INDUSTRIES. 2.EDUCATION TRAINING AND RE-TRAINING FOR OPERATIVES PAST OPERATIVES AND YOUNG PERSONS. 3.RELIEF OF BENEFICIARIES WHO ARE IN NEED BY VIRTUE OF THEIR POVERTY SICKNESS OR DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
MANOR ROYAL
CRAWLEY
WEST SUSSEX
RH10 9QP
- Phone:
- 03002000600
- Email:
- charitabletrust@bandce.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window