THE CHARTERED INSTITUTE OF LOGISTICS AND TRANSPORT IN THE UK

Charity number: 1004963
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 22 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 22 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 29 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 29 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 04 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 04 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 30 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 30 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 12 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 12 July 2017 On time Download