THE CHARTERED INSTITUTE OF LOGISTICS AND TRANSPORT IN THE UK

Charity number: 1004963
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £4.68m £4.44m £4.34m £4.54m £4.04m
Total expenditure £4.63m £4.28m £4.35m £4.36m £3.83m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £116.00k £194.57k £192.00k
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £165.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £46.00k £117.00k £139.00k £138.00k £118.00k
Income - Other trading activities £356.00k £259.00k £264.00k £284.00k £301.00k
Income - Charitable activities £4.21m £3.96m £3.86m £3.92m £3.30m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £49.00k £64.00k £67.00k £79.00k £67.00k
Income - Other £17.00k £39.00k £14.00k £120.00k £252.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.48m £4.20m £4.27m £4.28m £3.77m
Expenditure - Raising funds £79.00k £87.00k £82.00k £82.00k £56.00k
Expenditure - Governance £76.00k £44.00k £73.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £113.00k £91.00k
Expenditure - Investment management £3.00k £12.00k £14.00k £5.00k £15.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0