Trustees THE CHARTERED INSTITUTE OF LOGISTICS AND TRANSPORT IN THE UK
Charity number: 1004963
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Vikram Kumar Singla | Chair | 23 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Bermingham | Trustee | 02 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul William Le Blond | Trustee | 23 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anna-jane Hunter | Trustee | 07 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sarah Louise Shaw | Trustee | 07 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Botham | Trustee | 23 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dean Clamp | Trustee | 23 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Philip Roe | Trustee | 04 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alan Bryn Jones | Trustee | 21 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOHN PUGH | Trustee | 02 November 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.