OHEL SARAH UK

Charity number: 1004992
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 02 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 02 September 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 25 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 22 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 22 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 28 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 28 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 11 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 11 December 2017 On time Download