OHEL SARAH UK

Charity number: 1004992
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £222.82k £205.13k £256.15k £370.62k £323.59k
Total expenditure £231.45k £215.86k £247.01k £316.39k £377.07k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A