Trustees THE WHITTLESEY CHARITY
Charity number: 1005069
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chloe Smith | Trustee | 25 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Bradshaw | Trustee | 20 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gary Martin Cook | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Elisabeth Brown | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Emily Davis | Trustee | 26 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robin Gerald Bailey | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
CHARLES EDWARD FISHER KITCHIN | Trustee | 22 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Philip David Green | Trustee | 27 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
CLAIRE LOUISE RAYNER | Trustee | 26 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP MILES OLDFIELD | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.