PENNYWELL NEIGHBOURHOOD CENTRE

Charity number: 1005148
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We offer activities that promote healthy living, the acquisition of life skills, independence and engagement with neighbours. These vary based on the needs and the expressed wishes of our users. Currently we provide: HEALTH, WELL-BEING AND SELF CARE EDUCATION, GARDENING CLUB, ARTS PROJECT, PEER MENTOR VOLUNTEERS, JOINT WORKING INITIATIVES WITH LOCAL PARTNERS, BREAKOUT (School Holiday Activities)

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £283,375
Total expenditure: £223,319

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Recreation
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Sunderland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 October 1991: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sharon Gunn Trustee 22 April 2024
None on record
David Thompson Trustee 21 November 2022
None on record
Kevin Doran Trustee 25 April 2019
None on record
Leanne Moore Trustee 25 January 2018
None on record
Esdaile Boyling Trustee 21 September 2017
None on record
Peter Lovegrove Trustee 30 April 2015
None on record
SUE FOSTER Trustee 05 January 2012
None on record
BEVERLEY BULMER Trustee 05 January 2012
None on record
DENISE HALEY Trustee
None on record
JULIE HANLY Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £184.30k £289.97k £205.92k £257.11k £283.38k
Total expenditure £195.92k £218.01k £216.92k £234.28k £223.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £25.00k £31.14k £39.45k £32.09k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 19 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 19 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 09 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 09 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 22 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 22 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 13 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 13 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 03 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 03 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Pennywell Neighbourhood Centre
Pennywell Shopping Centre
Portsmouth Road
SUNDERLAND
SR4 9AS
Phone:
01915341477