Accounts and annual returns GEMACH NETZIV OSHER

Charity number: 1005259
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 03 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 20 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 24 May 2020 114 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 03 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required