NEW DIRECTIONS (RUGBY) LIMITED

Charity number: 1005302
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JV Phillips Trustee 03 May 2016 None on record
Philip John Hughes Trustee 07 November 2017 None on record
JULIA SANDERS Trustee 10 January 2012
FRIENDS OF IBBA GIRLS SCHOOL, SOUTH SUDAN Received: On time
MARGARET SEDGLEY Trustee 26 May 2009 None on record
Diana Joan Rayner Trustee 08 September 2015 None on record
WENDY BACK Chair 05 November 2008 None on record
MARTIN ROBERT ORRILL Trustee 16 February 2017 None on record
Alison Lucy Gregory Trustee 12 November 2019 None on record
SUKHRAJ SINGH BARHEY Trustee 18 December 2015 None on record