ABNEY PARK TRUST

Charity number: 1005334
Charity reporting is up to date (75 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £46.90k £48.30k £54.58k £53.10k £47.85k
Total expenditure £37.41k £45.25k £52.12k £51.00k £62.00k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £20.00k £20.00k £20.00k £20.00k £20.00k