TUNBURY SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1005560
Charity reporting is up to date (92 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £23.97k £23.25k £28.28k £36.55k £20.44k
Total expenditure £16.67k £30.30k £26.99k £33.57k £19.02k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A