BOLTON LE SANDS FREE GRAMMAR SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1005668
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of accomodation and facilities for a wide range of village organisations to meet for educational and leisure purposes.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £4,142
Total expenditure: £4,205

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Lancashire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 November 1991: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ANTHONY WOOF JACKSON MBE JP Chair
None on record
Rev Peter Graham Hamborg Trustee 11 July 2022
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY BOLTON LE SANDS CARNFORTH
Received: On time
THOMAS ROBINSON'S CHARITY
Received: On time
Kevin Beaumont Trustee 22 November 2021
None on record
KEITH BUDDEN Trustee 12 June 2011
LUNE VALLEY TRANSPORT ENTERPRISE LIMITED
Received: On time
LANCASTER CHARITY
Received: On time
PLATTEN AND BENSON ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
ANTHONY KNOWLES WOOD Trustee 12 June 2011
None on record
SHEILA POLLITT Trustee
None on record
JOAN BAKER Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £12.17k £31.14k £32.54k £12.07k £4.14k
Total expenditure £12.17k £31.14k £32.54k £12.07k £4.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £8.91k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 09 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 17 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 16 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 13 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 02 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 17 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 07 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
3 TOWN END
BOLTON LE SANDS
CARNFORTH
LA5 8JF
Phone:
01524824384
Website:

bolton.le.sands