THE CITY OF LONDON ALMSHOUSES

Charity number: 1005857
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £332.91k £363.63k £346.55k £349.24k £333.83k
Total expenditure £309.05k £308.65k £344.79k £377.18k £255.22k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A