FRIENDS OF WHITTINGTON SCHOOL

Charity number: 1006357
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Raises funds to support and enhance learning at Whittington School.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £8,206
Total expenditure: £10,975

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Shropshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 November 1991: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lauren Griffiths Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Dr Vivienne Rees Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Clare Frost Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £5.47k £5.83k £9.50k £9.82k £8.21k
Total expenditure £3.42k £6.53k £8.68k £5.84k £10.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 08 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 01 September 2024 63 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 12 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 14 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 22 June 2021 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Whittington C Of E Primary School
Station Road
Whittington
OSWESTRY
Shropshire
SY11 4DA
Phone:
01691662269
Website:

No information available