DR SUSIL KUMAR AND JAMILA MITRA CHARITABLE TRUST(UK )
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote, develop and research complementary and alternative medicine with an emphasis on homeopathy and acupuncture and to explore its integration with conventional medicine.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 November 1991: Standard registration
- 10 August 2010: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- MITRA CHARITY (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2005 | 05/04/2006 | 05/04/2007 | 05/04/2008 | 05/04/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.67k | £16.18k | £16.04k | £18.23k | £18.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.80k | £34.51k | £26.30k | £22.85k | £14.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2009 | 20 January 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2009 | 20 July 2010 | 165 days late | |
Annual return | 05 April 2008 | 13 February 2009 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2008 | 13 February 2009 | 8 days late | |
Annual return | 05 April 2007 | 01 February 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2007 | 01 February 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2006 | 05 February 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2006 | 05 February 2007 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 12TH. NOVEMBER 1991
Charitable objects
(1)TO PROMOTE AND DEVELOP ADVANCED RESEARCH IN MEDICAL SCIENCES AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE ALTERNATIVE COMPLEMENTARY SYSTEMS OF HOMEOPATHY, ACUPUNCTURE AND ACUPRESSURE. (2)TO PROMOTE AND DEVELOP MEDICAL TECHNIQUES FOR THE TREATMENT OF DISEASES BY THE ALTERNATIVE COMPLEMENTARY SYSTEMS OF HOMEOPATHY, ACUPUNTURE AND ACUPRESSURE OR BY CONVENTIONAL METHODS(ALLOPATHY) AND TO RESEARCH, PROMOTE AND DEVELOP THEIR COMPLEMENTARY PRACTICE INVOLVING THE CREATION OF A MEDICAL STRATEGY CAPABLE OF BRIDGING THE DIFFERENCES IN TECHNIQUES AND OF MERGING THE BEST ASPECTS IN THE DIFFERENT SYSTEMS OF MEDICINE. (3)TO GIVE AWARDS AND MAKE GRANTS TO UNIVERSITIES,MEDICAL SCHOOLS OR OTHER SUITABLE CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS FOR THE PURPOSE OF PROMOTING RESEARCH INTO AND TEACHING HOMEOPATHY, ACUPUNCTURE AND ACUPRESSURE. (4)TO UNDERTAKE,AID,ASSIST,CONDUCT,CARRY ON,OR PROMOTE THE STUDY AND RESEARCH AND TRAINING OF PERSONS IN ALL ASPECTS OF HOMEOPATHY, ACUPUNCTURE AND ACUPRESSURE TO PROMOTE THEIR WIDESPREAD USE AS AN INEXPENSIVE AND EFFECTIVE MEANS OF MEDICINE AND TO PUBLISH AND DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS OF ANY SUCH RESEARCH FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window