Accounts and annual returns FUNDRAISING FRIENDS OF WELTON ST MARY'S ACADEMY (WSMA)

Charity number: 1006646
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 06 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 13 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 25 March 2021 268 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 04 January 2020 188 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 10 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required