Financial history FUNDRAISING FRIENDS OF WELTON ST MARY'S ACADEMY (WSMA)

Charity number: 1006646
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £10.95k £11.33k £10.98k £5.17k £3.76k
Total expenditure £11.10k £11.33k £13.63k £3.64k £7.46k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A