DEARNE VALLEY VENTURE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's aim is to relieve the effects of economic and social exclusion in our local community. We run a Centre offering recreation, training and social interaction for people of all ages. The activities we offer are in response to local need and requests. We are fully independent, allowing us to act impartially. We also act as an umbrella organisation for local groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £16,970 from 3 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Barnsley
- Doncaster
- Rotherham
Governance
- 04 December 1991: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicola Lovell | Trustee | 11 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Jane Pearson | Trustee | 11 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alan George | Trustee | 11 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Roberts | Trustee | 11 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Birkin | Trustee | 15 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Scott | Trustee | 15 November 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.42k | £44.08k | £35.31k | £66.33k | £72.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.40k | £39.13k | £38.21k | £58.78k | £62.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £6.21k | £64.83k | £16.97k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 17 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30 NOVEMBER 1989 AS AMENDED ON 16 SEPTEMBER 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 27 NOVEMBER 2003
Charitable objects
(1)TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AMONGST PERSONS IN THE DEARNE VALEY AREA OF SOUTH YORKSHIRE WITH PARTICULAR REGARD TO SUCH PERSONS WHO ARE UNEMPLOYED OR ARE SUFFERING THE CONSEQUENCES OF UNEMPLOYMENT,THROUGH THE PROVISION OF TRAINING AND THROUGH SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE MEANS AS MAY BE DEEMED APPROPRIATE.(2)TO ADVANCE AND ENCOURAGE THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES OF LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE AFORESAID PERSONS IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE QUALITY OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS
Area of benefit
DEARNE VALLEY AREA OF SOUTH YORKSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
DEARNE RENAISSANCE CENTRE
PRIORY ROAD
BOLTON UPON DEARNE
ROTHERHAM
S63 8AE
- Phone:
- 07368457230
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window