YORKSHIRE PROFICIENCY TEST COMMITTEE

Charity number: 1006706
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £326.12k £330.38k £259.11k £229.34k £160.82k
Total expenditure £296.47k £289.70k £247.94k £214.83k £151.01k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A