ROCHDALE LAW CENTRE

Charity number: 1006740
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £169.00k £142.45k £112.76k £16.33k £0
Total expenditure £192.00k £185.92k £182.89k £74.99k £6.66k
Income from government contracts £90.00k £90.00k £84.00k £16.33k N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A