Trustees CLITHEROE CONCERTS SOCIETY
Charity number: 1006818
Charity reporting is overdue by 73 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bob Buller | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr John Burgess | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Analisa Jane Smith | Trustee | 27 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Frank Robinson | Trustee | 05 July 2017 |
|
|||||
EVELYN GORST | Trustee | 21 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA MILNE-REDHEAD | Trustee | 21 January 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.