Trustees THE WORLD OF GLASS (ST HELENS) LIMITED
Charity number: 1006990

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT CHARLES HEPWORTH MBE | Chair |
|
|
|||||||
Kevin Crooks | Trustee | 13 December 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Tanya Marie Wilcock | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Stephen Gareth Lingard | Trustee | 24 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
John Francis Tabern | Trustee | 24 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
SUSAN WILLIAMSON | Trustee | 18 November 2014 |
|
|
||||||
PAUL SOMERSET COUSINS | Trustee | 21 December 2011 |
|
|
||||||
KIRSTY PILKINGTON | Trustee | 21 December 2011 |
|
|
||||||
David Bricknell | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.