EAST SHROPSHIRE TALKING NEWSPAPER

Charity number: 1007044
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 02 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 14 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 13 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 25 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required