Financial history MILTON KEYNES ARTS CENTRE LTD

Charity number: 1007409
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £272.05k £330.30k £306.33k £324.14k £293.21k
Total expenditure £271.12k £307.59k £333.97k £269.68k £326.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £87.61k £143.00k £123.01k £279.81k £259.52k