Trustees MILTON KEYNES ARTS CENTRE LTD
Charity number: 1007409

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Laura Margaret Keen | Chair | 01 February 2019 |
|
|||||
Emma Stone | Trustee | 27 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kyle Abraham Kirkpatrick | Trustee | 27 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alice Daisy Barnett | Trustee | 20 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Haithan Askar | Trustee | 21 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Frederick Clements | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael Smythe | Trustee | 30 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Allawee Albaghdadi | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|||||
Valerie Wallersteiner | Trustee | 30 June 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.