Accounts and annual returns BROOKFIELD PRIMARY SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1007492
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 20 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 20 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 19 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 19 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 13 October 2023 105 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 13 October 2023 105 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 04 October 2022 96 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 13 October 2021 105 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 13 October 2021 105 days late Download Open in new window