BROOKFIELD PRIMARY SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1007492
Charity reporting is up to date (105 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £23.94k £24.88k £56.95k £24.46k £36.64k
Total expenditure £27.93k £24.72k £33.50k £177 £5.92k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A