COVENTRY PANAHGHAR PROJECT

Charity number: 1007676
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £584.74k £507.44k £571.63k £615.20k £793.49k
Total expenditure £686.34k £604.04k £588.38k £558.81k £752.40k
Income from government contracts £447.48k £369.78k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £859 £343 £340 £465 £465
Income - Other trading activities £134.97k £136.05k £136.43k £133.57k £34.29k
Income - Charitable activities £447.48k £369.78k £434.17k £480.10k £757.63k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.43k £1.26k £684 £1.07k £1.11k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £549.04k £454.12k £447.15k £425.14k £717.34k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £149.93k £141.23k £133.67k £35.06k
Expenditure - Governance £23.53k £0 £20.33k £20.04k £16.15k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £4.14k £0
Expenditure - Other £137.30k £0 £0 £0 £0