Accounts and annual returns LAMBETH COMMUNITY OF REFUGEES FROM VIETNAM LIMITED

Charity number: 1008023
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 146 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 146 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 511 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 511 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 877 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 877 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1242 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1242 days
Annual return 31 March 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1607 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1607 days