29TH CROYDON (ST JOHNS) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1008027
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £19.62k £20.28k £27.69k £22.73k £5.46k
Total expenditure £9.33k £9.40k £14.70k £21.86k £12.58k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A