Accounts and annual returns HOWARD OF EFFINGHAM CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1008049
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 02 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 10 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 23 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 20 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required