SAINT BENEDICT SCHOOL TRUST

Charity number: 1008247
Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 Overdue Overdue by 91 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Overdue Overdue by 91 days
Annual return 31 October 2019 28 September 2020 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 28 September 2020 28 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 28 September 2020 456 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 29 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 29 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 28 June 2018 363 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 28 June 2018 363 days late Download